Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prescription Monitoring Data - Health Care Facility
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program to disclose prescription monitoring data, in accordance with certain regulations, to the medical director or authorized administrator of certain health care facilities, or the medical director's or authorized administrator's designee, for the purpose of providing medical or pharmaceutical treatment to a patient or prospective patient of the health care facility.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1338
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prescription Monitoring Data - Health Care Facility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Prescription Monitoring Data - Health Care Facility
Senate 3/08/2019 3/11/2019 Rereferred to Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-114, 21-2A-06 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM