Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Equal Pay Commission to study and promote research on wage disparities and recommend ways to remediate wage disparities in the public and private sectors, between men and women and between minorities and nonminorities; requiring an employer to include specified information in a job advertisement to recruit an employee or individual contractor to fill a position within the employer's organization; prohibiting an employer from seeking salary history information by specified methods; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0401
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-303, 3-303.1, 3-304.1, 3-307, 3-307.1, 3-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM