Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Disclosure of Tax Benefits - Nonprofit Hospitals
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Madaleno, and Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each nonprofit hospital, each year, to submit to the Comptroller an itemized list of certain tax benefits; requiring the Comptroller to prepare a certain report and to post the report on the Comptroller's website; and requiring the Comptroller, in consultation with certain employee organizations, to adopt certain regulations.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1541
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Disclosure of Tax Benefits - Nonprofit Hospitals
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Disclosure of Tax Benefits - Nonprofit Hospitals
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Reassigned to Finance 22
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM