Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Labor – Electricians – State Licensing Workgroup
Sponsored by
Senators McCray, Hershey, and Klausmeier
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 591
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to convene a workgroup to study certain issues regarding the provision of electrical services and low-voltage electrical services in the State; requiring the workgroup to include certain representatives; requiring the Department to provide certain notice of certain meetings to certain persons; requiring the Department to submit a report on the findings of the workgroup to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2020; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1127
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Electricians Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {864232/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Labor – Electricians – State Licensing Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (115-14)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-16)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 591
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Department of Labor – Electricians – State Licensing Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Electricians Act of 2020
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {864232/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Labor – Electricians – State Licensing Workgroup
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Economic Matters 47BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (115-14) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (106-16) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 591
Text - Chapter - Department of Labor – Electricians – State Licensing Workgroup
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page