Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teaching Techniques - Students with Special Needs and Limited English Proficiency
Sponsored by
Senator Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to ensure that certified teachers receive adequate instruction in techniques for teaching students with special needs and students with limited English proficiency and in appropriate behavior interventions; applying the Act to teachers certified at specified times; and requiring the Department to adopt regulations.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0661
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-122 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM