Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day
Sponsored by
Senators Carozza, Bailey, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Ellis, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Lee, Peters, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that July 27 each year is Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day in recognition of the service and sacrifice of Korean War veterans.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1376
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day
Senate 3/21/2019 3/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-414, 7-414 through 7-417 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM