Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Reinsurance - Certification of Reinsurers
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to use information provided by the National Association of Insurance Commissioners (NAIC) committee process to take specified actions relating to an applicant for certification as a reinsurer in Maryland; requiring the Commissioner to consider the list of conditionally qualified jurisdictions published through the NAIC committee process in determining the qualified jurisdictions in the State under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1465
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {177679/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2014 2/12/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {177679/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 51
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-909, 5-910 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM