Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recordation Tax - Exemptions
Sponsored by
Senators Peters and DeGrange
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering an exemption from recordation tax to include certain transactions of an original mortgagor; altering the definitions of "business entity", "owner", and "ownership interest" for purposes of provisions of law exempting from the recordation tax transfers between certain related business entities; and altering an exemption from recordation tax for certain transfers of a controlling interest.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Recordation Tax - Exemptions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {159235/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Recordation Tax - Exemptions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Recordation Tax - Exemptions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Recordation Tax - Exemptions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {159235/1 Adopted 48B
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48B
Text - Third - Recordation Tax - Exemptions
Senate 3/20/2018 3/18/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/21/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Text - Chapter - Recordation Tax - Exemptions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-108, 12-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM