Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Circuit Court Personnel - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law concerning the appointment and compensation of a law clerk for the St. Mary's County Circuit Court resident judge.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1185
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {578072/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
69
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {578072/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 69
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM