Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Funeral Directors, Morticians, and Crematory Operators - Disposition of Body by Cremation - Requirement and Liability
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain practitioner to dispose of the body of a decedent by cremation if the practitioner receives a certain authorizing document; prohibiting a certain practitioner from requesting or soliciting the consent of certain persons or considering the objection of certain persons to the cremation of a certain body before cremating a certain body if the practitioner received a certain document; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Funeral Directors, Morticians, and Crematory Operators - Disposition of Body by Cremation - Requirement and Liability
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   5-508, 5-509, 5-509.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page