Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
21st–Century Economy Fairness Act
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to distribute the sales and use tax revenue on the sale or use of certain digital products to The Blueprint for Maryland's Future Fund; defining "digital product" as one that is obtained electronically by the buyer or delivered by certain means; applying the sales and use tax to a sale or use of certain digital products; providing that the retail sale of a certain digital code or digital product shall be presumed to be made in the state in which a certain customer tax address is located; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0932
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - 21st-Century Economy Sales Tax Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {999231/1
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {999231/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {149233/3 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - 21st–Century Economy Fairness Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - 21st-Century Economy Sales Tax Act
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {999231/1 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted 47A
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {999231/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Floor Committee Amendment {149233/3 Adopted 48
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - 21st–Century Economy Fairness Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/4/2020 5:21 PM