Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - State Boat Act - Carbon Monoxide Safety (Matthew's Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to require that a course of instruction in boating safety education include certain information relating to carbon monoxide poisoning; requiring the Department to adopt regulations requiring certain warning labels to be affixed to certain used vessels sold within the State; prohibiting a dealer from selling a certain used vessel in the State unless the dealer ensures that a certain warning label has been affixed to the vessel in accordance with certain regulations; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Natural Resources - State Boat Act - Carbon Monoxide Safety (Matthew's Law)
Senate 3/14/2019 3/15/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-701, 8-712.2, 8-745 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM