Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
21st-Century Economy Sales Tax Act
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to distribute the sales and use tax revenue on the sale or use of certain digital products to the Education Trust Fund; defining "digital product" as one that is obtained electronically by the buyer and delivered by certain means through the use of technology having electrical, digital, magnetic, wireless, optical, electromagnetic, or similar capabilities; applying the sales and use tax to a sale or use of certain digital products; providing that the sales and use tax does not apply to a certain service; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0932
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - 21st-Century Economy Sales Tax Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - 21st-Century Economy Sales Tax Act
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2020 1:42 PM