Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Uniform Claims Form - Electronic Submission by Insured
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an insured, a member, or a subscriber to submit a specified claims form by electronic transfer; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1130
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2014 2/12/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2014 3/18/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/18/2014 3/19/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1004 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM