Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018)
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Manno, Conway, Guzzone, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing Healthy Maryland as a public corporation and a unit of State government to provide comprehensive universal health coverage for every Maryland resident; requiring Healthy Maryland to provide certain services, a certain system, certain choice and access to certain coordinators and certain providers, and certain financing for residents of the State on or before January 1, 2020; establishing the Healthy Maryland Board to organize, administer, and market Healthy Maryland and Healthy Maryland Services as a single-payer program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1516
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   25-101 through 25-1204 )
(   31-101, 31-104, 31-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM