Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Pet Cemeteries - Establishment and Operational Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting pet cemeteries from the registration and permitting requirements of the Office of Cemetery Oversight; requiring the owner of specified land used or to be used as a pet cemetery to file a specified declaration in the office of the clerk of the circuit court of the county in which the land is located; providing for the execution and recordation of the declaration; providing that the restriction may be removed in accordance with specified provisions of law; prohibiting the interment of a human body in a pet cemetery; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2014 2/12/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-102, 5-405, 5-8A-01 through 5-8A-08 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM