Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Information Technology - Data Sharing and Integration
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the duties of the Secretary of Information Technology to include the permitting of data sharing and integration among specified units of State government; establishing the Management Intelligence Incentive Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring the Governor to submit with the State budget specified information about the Fund and projects supported by the Fund; authorizing specified State units to request specified project funding from the Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1425
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3A-303 through 3A-305, 3A-310, 3A-310 through 3A-313, 6-226 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM