Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pilot Program - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, DeGrange, Edwards, Jennings, King, Mathias, Middleton, and Peters
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to adopt regulations requiring a video lottery facility licensee to adopt procedures to offer players the opportunity to donate coins, when receiving cash on payout, to the Maryland Veterans Trust Fund; and requiring the Commission to adopt regulations requiring a licensee to attach donation boxes near exits in a video lottery facility for specified purposes; requiring the Commission to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0202
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Committee Amendment (Budget and Taxation) {119931/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 50
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Committee Amendment (Budget and Taxation) {119931/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-04, 9-913 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM