Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Commission to Study the Establishment of a Truancy Reduction Program
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission to Study the Establishment of a Truancy Reduction Program in Baltimore County; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Maryland Judicial Conference to designate a representative to act in an advisory capacity to the Commission; requiring the Commission to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to specified individuals; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {264734/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {264734/1 Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 55A
House 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM