Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent Increases
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified owner of a mobile home park to provide written notice of any increase in the annual rent for a site to a specified resident, a specified homeowners association, and the Division of Consumer Protection in the Office of the Attorney General at least 90 days before the effective date of the increase; authorizing an increase in annual rent to exceed an increase in a specified index only under specified circumstances; requiring a park owner to schedule a specified meeting and provide specified information; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent Increases
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Text - First - Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent Increases
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8A-101, 8A-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM