Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act - Criminal Penalties
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum penalty for second degree murder from 30 years to 40 years; repealing mandatory minimum sentences for specified offenses involving distribution of a controlled dangerous substance; and altering the maximum penalties for specified offenses involving distribution of a controlled dangerous substance.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1313
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-204, 5-607, 5-608, 5-609, 5-609.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM