Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of the construction practice term "Coast Smart" to include highway facilities; requiring the Coast Smart Council, in conjunction with the Department of Natural Resources and the Department of Transportation, to establish Coast Smart siting and design criteria to address sea level rise inundation and coastal flood impacts on State and local projects; requiring a local jurisdiction that experiences nuisance flooding to develop a plan to address the flooding by July 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1350
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884633/1
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Mathias) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884633/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Mathias) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884633/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884633/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {263826/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {120611/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-41)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-7)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, Mitigation, and Disclosure
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {884633/1 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Mathias) Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {884633/1 46
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Mathias) Adopted 46
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {884633/1 46
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Miller) Adopted 46
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {884633/1 Adopted 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {263826/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, Mitigation, and Disclosure
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (40-7) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 50
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {120611/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (96-41) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (39-7) 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Text - Chapter - Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1001, 3-1002 through 3-1004, 3-1009, 3-1012, 3-1015, 3-1018 )
(   3-101, 8-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM