Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support - Suspension of Payments and Arrears for Incarcerated Obligors - Modifications
Sponsored by
Senators Carter, Hettleman, Smith, Sydnor, West, and Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 122
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a condition relating to an incarcerated obligor's term of imprisonment under which the obligor's child support payment is not considered past due and arrearages will not accrue if the obligor was sentenced to a term of imprisonment of 180 consecutive calendar days or more.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {202111/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (114-21)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-32)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 122
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Child Support - Suspension of Payments and Arrears for Incarcerated Obligors - Modifications
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Child Support - Suspension of Payments and Arrears for Incarcerated Obligors - Modifications
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Judiciary 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments {202111/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (114-21) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (102-32) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Child Support - Suspension of Payments and Arrears for Incarcerated Obligors - Modifications
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 122
Text - Chapter - Child Support - Suspension of Payments and Arrears for Incarcerated Obligors - Modifications
(   12-104.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page