Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program and Trust
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Astle, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Guzzone, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Pugh, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program and Trust for private sector employees; establishing the Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Board to implement, maintain, and administer the Program and the Trust; requiring the Board to take any action to ensure that the Program is not preempted by federal law, to establish procedures and disclosures to protect the interests of participants and employers, and to disseminate to employers and employees information about the Program prior to enrollment; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1378
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {759237/1
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Brochin) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {759237/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {963794/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {143892/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (92-44)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Finance
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments {759237/1 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Laid Over (Senator Brochin) Adopted 51
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {759237/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {963794/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Floor Committee Amendment {143892/1 Adopted 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (92-44) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101 through 12-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM