Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Evidence of Blood Test
Sponsored by
Senator Cassilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, if a law enforcement officer testifies that the officer witnessed the taking of a blood specimen by a person who the officer reasonably believed was a qualified medical person, the officer's testimony shall be sufficient evidence that the person was a qualified medical person without testimony by the person who obtained the blood specimen; repealing specified procedures relating to the admissibility of evidence of a blood test in a prosecution for specified drunk or drugged driving offenses; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0773
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page