Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Liquidated Damages
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Manno, Kelley, Middleton, and Pugh
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 707
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making a contractor under a public work contract that knew or reasonably should have known of the contractor's obligation to pay the prevailing wage rate and that deliberately failed or refused to pay to the prevailing wage rate liable to the public body for liquidated damages of $250 for each laborer or other employee under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0689
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {567879/1
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {567879/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-46)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 707
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {567879/1 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments {567879/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 59
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (95-46) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 707
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM