Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and Services
Sponsored by
Senators Brinkley, Forehand, Kelley, King, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Middleton, Pipkin, and Pugh
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a local department of social services and the Developmental Disabilities Administration to plan for the transfer of responsibility for the case management, care, supervision, and treatment of a medically fragile child with a developmental disability who is committed to the custody of the local department when the child attains 21 years of age and to develop jointly a transition plan that ensures continuity of residential placement and an appropriate level of services; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1460
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {697379/1
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Brinkley) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {697379/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {697379/1
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {113424/2 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2013 2/21/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments {697379/1 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Laid Over (Senator Brinkley) Adopted 56
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {697379/1 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Kelley) Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {697379/1 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {113424/2 Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-801, 3-804, 3-823.1 )
(   1-101, 5-327.1, 5-328, 5-525.3 )
(   1-101, 7-101, 7-403, 7-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM