Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Domestic Animals - Sterilization and Life-Sustaining Care of Cats - Determination of Dangerousness
Sponsored by
Senators Benson and Stone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a law prohibiting a person who owns, possesses, or has custody of a domestic animal from dropping or leaving the animal on a road, in a public place, or on private property with the intent to abandon the animal does not apply to a person who is providing sterilization or life-sustaining care to a specified cat that is not owned or lacks visible owner identification; providing that a county or local government may not prohibit a person from providing sterilization or life-sustaining care to a specified cat; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1473
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2014 2/12/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-612, 10-624 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM