Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Municipal Water Supply Contamination - Remediation Costs
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of the Environment to use the Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund for specified purposes and under specified circumstances; requiring, if the Fund is used to pay specified costs, priority be given to costs associated with remediation projects that involve specified technology; requiring the Department to use the Fund to pay for cleanup, corrective action, and treatment of contamination of the water supply of the Town of Chestertown on the detection of a specified contaminant; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1307
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-411 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM