Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

SB1010


CH0592

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsored by
Senators Peters and Bailey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Maryland Code of Military Justice; providing for jurisdiction and applicability of the Act; providing for authority of certain judge advocates; establishing the rights of certain victims; providing for the apprehension and restraint of certain offenders; providing for certain non-judicial punishment; establishing the jurisdiction for certain courts-martial; providing for the appointment and composition of certain courts-martial; establishing certain pre-trial procedures; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1139
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (131-1)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed 50
Text - Third - Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Judiciary 51
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (131-1) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-801 through 13-814,   13A-101 through 13A-1112 )
Last Updated: 6/10/2020 2:31 PM