Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Student Education Loans - Ombudsman and Licensing of Servicers
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Benson, Guzzone, Lee, Madaleno, Peters, Robinson, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to designate an individual to serve as the Student Loan Ombudsman; establishing the duties and responsibilities of the Student Loan Ombudsman; requiring the Ombudsman, in consultation with the Commissioner, to establish a certain student loan borrower education course with certain requirements; prohibiting a person from engaging in student education loan servicing unless the person is licensed by the Commissioner or is exempt from licensing; establishing application requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1642
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {447670/1
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Student Education Loans - Ombudsman and Licensing of Servicers
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {447670/1 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 62A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-1101 through 12-1122, 2-104.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM