Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and Maryland Higher Education Commission - Workgroup to Examine the Need for Dental Therapy
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and the Maryland Higher Education Commission to jointly convene a workgroup to examine the need for dental therapy in the State; requiring the workgroup to include specified stakeholders; and requiring the workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2017.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1214
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Dental Therapists - Licensure
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994432/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations - Dental Therapists - Licensure
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {994432/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and Maryland Higher Education Commission - Workgroup to Examine the Need for Dental Therapy
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 51
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM