Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Clean Energy Workforce Account in the Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now Program; providing the Account be used for grants for strategic industry partnerships for pre-apprenticeship job training for careers in the clean energy industry, or to provide pathways to advance existing careers within the clean energy industry; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to include specified information about the Clean Energy Workforce Account in a specified annual report; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-708.1, 11-709 )
(   7-702, 7-703, 7-703.1, 7-705 )
(   9-1A-35, 9-20B-01, 9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM