Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating in Anne Arundel County a BWLT beer, wine, and liquor (on-premises) tasting license; specifying that the BWLT and BWT licenses may be issued to specified persons; creating a license fee schedule for a BWLT license and altering the fee schedule for a BWT beer and wine (on-premises) tasting license; and specifying limitations on the amount of alcoholic beverages that may be offered for on-premises consumption.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0591
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {324138/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {253190/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2014 2/12/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Favorable with Amendments {324138/1 Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/24/2014 3/17/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {253190/1 Report Adopted 60
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) 61
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendment 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Passed Enrolled 58
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page