Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Fantasy Competitions - Operators and Video Lottery Facilities
Sponsored by
Senator Miller
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to adopt certain regulations related to fantasy competitions; authorizing, subject to a certain referendum, the Commission to authorize the holder of a certain license to offer fantasy competitions to the public; submitting certain provisions of the Act to a referendum of the qualified voters of the State; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Gaming - Fantasy Competitions - Operators and Video Lottery Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Gaming - Fantasy Competitions - Operators and Video Lottery Facilities
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-114 )
(   9-1D-01, 9-1D-02 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM