Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments
Sponsored by
Senators Frosh, Astle, Garagiola, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Ramirez, and Pugh
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a private lender to provide capital for a loan provided under a local Clean Energy Loan Program; providing that, with the consent of any holder of a mortgage or deed of trust on the property, a county or municipality may collect loan payments owed on a commercial loan to a private lender or to a county or municipality through a surcharge on a property owner's property tax bill; providing that an unpaid surcharge constitutes a lien against the property on which it is imposed under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {777978/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Garagiola) {587070/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {777978/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Garagiola) {587070/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 65
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-1101, 1-1102, 1-1103, 1-1104, 1-1105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM