Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Awards of Certain Fees and Costs and Prohibition Against Retaliation
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the court, on a specified finding in an action on behalf of an employee for a violation of the Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law, to award the Attorney General reasonable counsel fees and other costs; authorizing the court, on a specified finding in an action by an employee for a violation of the Wage Payment and Collection Law, to award the employee reasonable counsel fees and other costs; prohibiting an employer from taking specified adverse action against an employee under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0872
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1314 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-507, 3-507.2, 3-507.3, 3-508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM