Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Employees of Qualifying Organizations
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that participation by certain organizations in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program may not impede, undermine, or conflict with certain obligations or statuses; establishing the Task Force to Study Cooperative Purchasing for Health Insurance; requiring the Task Force to report its recommendations on ways to control health costs and offer a variety of health benefit plan choices to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1131
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {887276/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {613725/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-13)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Expansion of Participating Units
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Reassigned to Finance 21
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {887276/1 Adopted 48B
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {613725/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted 48B
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48B
Text - Third - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Employees of Qualifying Organizations
Senate 3/20/2018 3/18/2018 Third Reading Passed (31-13) 49
House 3/21/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-501, 2-502, 2-503, 2-512, 2-513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM