Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsored by
Senator Raskin
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to provide that a county charter may provide for the filling of a vacancy in the office of chief executive officer or county executive of a county by special election; submitting an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; authorizing a special election to fill a vacancy in the office of chief executive officer or county executive of a charter county to be conducted by mail; etc.
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1415
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {434637/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable with Amendments {434637/1 Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-303, 8-401, 9-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM