Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Network Adequacy and Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to maintain an adequate and accessible pharmacy benefits manager network consisting of contracted pharmacies that provide convenient patient access to pharmacy services; authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to adopt certain regulations; prohibiting a pharmacy benefits manager from requiring a certain pharmacy or pharmacist to obtain certain accreditation, certification, or credentialing as a condition for participating in a certain network; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1307
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Network Adequacy and Reimbursement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Network Adequacy and Reimbursement
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1611.2, 15-1628, 15-1628.2, 15-1628.3 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:31 PM