Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and Duties
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership and duties of the Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth; authorizing youth or young adult members of the Task Force to receive a specified stipend as compensation for serving on the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to issue its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly in a preliminary report on or before November 1, 2014, and in a final report on or before June 1, 2015; and extending to June 30, 2015 the termination date of the Task Force.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0577
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM