Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Trafficking Victims - Establishment of Workgroup
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup to Study Single-Point Entry for Services and Criminal Immunity for Victims of Human Trafficking; providing the purpose of the Workgroup is to study issues relating to a single point of entry for minors who are victims of human trafficking; requiring the Workgroup to submit a final report on its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1202
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Human Trafficking Victims - Establishment of Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Human Trafficking Victims - Establishment of Workgroup
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM