Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Commerce - Employment in the State's Defense Industry - Army Alliance Study
Sponsored by
Senators Cassilly, Astle, Jennings, Middleton, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, Rosapepe, and Oaks
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Commerce, in conjunction with the Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, to conduct a study on employment in the State's defense industry; specifying the minimum requirements of the study; requiring the Department of Commerce to consult with specified entities; requiring the Department of Commerce to report, on or before December 31, 2017, to the General Assembly on the findings of the study; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1586
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {937676/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Department of Commerce - Employment in the State's Defense Industry - Army Alliance Study
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {937676/1 Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Text - Third - Department of Commerce - Employment in the State's Defense Industry - Army Alliance Study
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM