Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Rural Legacy Program
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on real property that is located in a Rural Legacy Area and for which the property owner has sold certain development rights under the Rural Legacy Program; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Rural Legacy Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Rural Legacy Program
Senate 3/14/2019 3/15/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM