Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Volunteer Auxiliary and Volunteer Reserve Police Officers
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "public safety officer" to include certain volunteer auxiliary or volunteer reserve police officers for purposes of a certain property tax credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Volunteer Auxiliary and Volunteer Reserve Police Officers
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/9/2020 2:41 PM