Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Change in Administrative Policy Affecting Voting Rights - Notice and Judicial Review
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections or a local board of elections that adopts a change in an administrative policy affecting voting rights to provide specified public notice of the change; providing for the form, content, and timing of the public notice; providing that an individual's right to vote may not be denied or abridged because the individual failed to comply with a change in an administrative policy affecting voting rights if the State Board or local board did not provide public notice of the change; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0645
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2016 2/17/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 12-301, 12-302, 1-305, 16-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM