Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Job Reinvestment Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Ferguson, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, Young, and Zirkin
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for specified small business entities located in an enterprise zone or a Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise (RISE) zone; allowing a small business to claim the credit if the business hired or retained at least one new employee for at least 6 months; allowing a small business to claim the credit for each employee who is hired that results in a net increase in the number of employees hired and retained by the business; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1051
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017, July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {769330/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Job Reinvestment Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Enterprise Zone and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Programs - Small Business Entities
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Favorable with Amendments {769330/1 Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Text - Third - Job Reinvestment Act of 2017
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1406, 5-707 )
(   10-741 )
(   9-103.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM