Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Baccalaureate Degrees - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting community colleges from awarding baccalaureate degrees; requiring baccalaureate degrees to be awarded by public senior higher education institutions, private nonprofit institutions of higher education, or out-of-state senior higher education institutions or for-profit institutions of higher education under certain circumstances; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Community Colleges - Baccalaureate Degrees - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {863623/1 (Senator Hershey) Withdrawn
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {103322/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Community Colleges - Baccalaureate Degrees - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (25-19)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (25-22)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Community Colleges - Baccalaureate Degrees - Prohibition
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 47
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {863623/1 (Senator Hershey) Withdrawn 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {103322/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Community Colleges - Baccalaureate Degrees - Prohibition
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (25-19) 48C
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Miller) Adopted 48C
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (25-22) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM