Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Green Business Zones
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating the Capitol Heights, Fairmount Heights, Glenarden, and Seat Pleasant green business zones in Prince George's County; requiring the Secretary of Business and Economic Development to designate a not-for-profit entity to establish specified job training, internship, and apprenticeship standards that a green business must meet to receive specified incentives; establishing the benefits available in the zones; establishing specified credits against the State income tax and specified property taxes; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Finance
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 3/19/2013 3/19/2013 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-601 through 12-605 )
(   10-702.1 )
(   9-103.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM