Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a secured party to petition the circuit court for leave to immediately commence an action to foreclose the mortgage or deed of trust on specified vacant and abandoned property; authorizing a county, municipal corporation, homeowners association, or condominium to notify a secured party of any vacant and abandoned property located in the county, municipal corporation, homeowners association, or condominium in a specified manner; specifying the contents of a specified notice; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0607
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.1, 7-105.14 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM